THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3942 50A Ave
Red Deer AB T4N 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, contact the Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital at 905-845-2571.
Date Received: 22 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3942 50A Ave
Red Deer AB T4N 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, contact the Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital at 905-845-2571.
Date Received: 22 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CECILIA DE GUZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GUZMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CECILIA DE GUZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GUZMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012