THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Connecticut
USA - Delaware
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Idaho
USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kansas
USA - Louisiana
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Missouri
USA - Montana
USA - Nebraska
USA - Nevada
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New Jersey
USA - New Mexico
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Oregon
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Rhode Island
USA - South Carolina
USA - Tennessee
USA - Texas
USA - Utah
USA - Vermont
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington
USA - Wisconsin
USA - Wyoming

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Connecticut
USA - Delaware
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Idaho
USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kansas
USA - Louisiana
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Missouri
USA - Montana
USA - Nebraska
USA - Nevada
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New Jersey
USA - New Mexico
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Oregon
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Rhode Island
USA - South Carolina
USA - Tennessee
USA - Texas
USA - Utah
USA - Vermont
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington
USA - Wisconsin
USA - Wyoming

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 May 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sajad Zalzala to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 25, 2023:
 
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Zalzala engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his prescribing.   In the face of this investigation, Dr. Zalzala, who’s certificate of registration expired in September 2021, has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 25 May 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sajad Zalzala to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 25, 2023:
 
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Zalzala engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his prescribing.   In the face of this investigation, Dr. Zalzala, who’s certificate of registration expired in September 2021, has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 28 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012