THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory
Association
501 Smyth road
Critical care wing, 4th floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138846200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Extension: 1020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 Aug 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory
Association
501 Smyth road
Critical care wing, 4th floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138846200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Extension: 1020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 31 Aug 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jan 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 30 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Cherif Kamal Safwat Ibrahim may practise medicine independently in
anatomical pathology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Cherif Kamal Safwat Ibrahim may practise medicine independently in
anatomical pathology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012