THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2983 Westoak Trails Blvd
Oakville Ontario L6M 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 825 3627
Fax: 905 825 0239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2983 Westoak Trails Blvd
Oakville Ontario L6M 5E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 825 3627
Fax: 905 825 0239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABAHAT JAMAL JAFRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABAHAT JAMAL JAFRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2012