THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3335 Dougall Ave.
Suite 103A
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 969-0580
Fax: (519) 966-1901
Address: Roseland After Hours Medical Clinic
3840 Howard Ave.
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 972-3944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3335 Dougall Ave.
Suite 103A
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 969-0580
Fax: (519) 966-1901
Address: Roseland After Hours Medical Clinic
3840 Howard Ave.
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 972-3944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMIN MULAOSMANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULAOSMANOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARMIN MULAOSMANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULAOSMANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012