THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-8809
Fax: 289-870-2629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan, ON L4A 4P9
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-8809
Fax: 289-870-2629

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Unit 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan, ON L4A 4P9
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA CHIU WEN TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA CHIU WEN TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2012