THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:30:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Frechette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Frechette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2012