THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:15:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CF H Svcs C Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Quinte Health Care
242 King St, Trenton ON K8V 5S6

Canadian Forces Health Services
713 Montreal Rd, Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 21 Jun 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casey-Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CF H Svcs C Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Quinte Health Care
242 King St, Trenton ON K8V 5S6

Canadian Forces Health Services
713 Montreal Rd, Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 21 Jun 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casey-Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILDRED-RUBY CASEY-CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY-CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILDRED-RUBY CASEY-CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY-CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2012