THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 08 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 08 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012