THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:14:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuropathology
Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuropathology
Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuropathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
23 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2015 to 22 Dec 2015
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
23 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2014 to 22 Dec 2014
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
16 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - R - Neuropathology
01 Oct 2012 to 15 Nov 2012
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
DATE: 23 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Dec 2015
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
DATE: 23 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Dec 2014
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
DATE: 04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
DATE: 16 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2012 to 15 Nov 2012
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012