THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Ellesmere Clinic
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-350-0550
Fax: 647-350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Ellesmere Clinic
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-350-0550
Fax: 647-350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHE NANA HOU LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOU LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHE NANA HOU LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOU LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2012