THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Majumder, Sampa (Used Until: 25 May 2014)
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 560 Albert Street
PO Box 445
Canada
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-3921
Fax: (613) 774-4004
Address: Dundas Manor Long Term Care
533 Clarence Street
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Phone: 613-612-7444
Fax: 613-774-4004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Majumder, Sampa (Used Until: 25 May 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 560 Albert Street
PO Box 445
Canada
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-3921
Fax: (613) 774-4004
Address: Dundas Manor Long Term Care
533 Clarence Street
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Phone: 613-612-7444
Fax: 613-774-4004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMPA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMPA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012