THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:24:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
24 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Oct 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Oct 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2012