THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King's College London (London), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Environmental Health Clinic
Toronto ON M5S 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-351-3764
Fax: 416-323-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King's College London (London), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Environmental Health Clinic
Toronto ON M5S 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-351-3764
Fax: 416-323-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNNE SWALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWALES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNNE SWALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWALES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King's College London (London), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2012