THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:45:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON K7P 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-887-8733
Fax: 613-544-3288
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient to contact office or hospital where seen by physician.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON K7P 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-887-8733
Fax: 613-544-3288
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient to contact office or hospital where seen by physician.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY LEIGH MARY WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY LEIGH MARY WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012