THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Kennedy road
unit B2
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-490-0499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Phone: 1 866-349-3869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1T 3K4
Phone: 6472453070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Narges Nassirinejad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Kennedy road
unit B2
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-490-0499
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 0C5
Phone: 1 866-349-3869
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1T 3K4
Phone: 6472453070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Narges Nassirinejad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGES NASSIRINEJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSIRINEJAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGES NASSIRINEJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSIRINEJAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2012