THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:25:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Respirology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: 416 323 6132
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
99 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN-Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Feb 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Division of Respirology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: 416 323 6132
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
99 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN-Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Feb 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OWEN DANIEL LYONS may practise medicine independently in respirology and sleep medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OWEN DANIEL LYONS may practise medicine independently in respirology and sleep medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2012