THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:12:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Extension: 6858
Fax: (905)813-4229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 14 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Extension: 6858
Fax: (905)813-4229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 14 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEDRO LUIS CARRERA GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRERA GARCIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEDRO LUIS CARRERA GARCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRERA GARCIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2012