THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Colony Farm Road
Forensic Psychiatric Hospital
Coquitlam British Columbia V3C 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 524-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Colony Farm Road
Forensic Psychiatric Hospital
Coquitlam British Columbia V3C 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 524-7700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIROSLAVA STINGU-BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINGU-BAXTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIROSLAVA STINGU-BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINGU-BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2012