THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:40:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universit‚ de Kinshasa, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-1884 Merivale Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-0888
Fax: 613-737-0222

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universit‚ de Kinshasa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-1884 Merivale Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-0888
Fax: 613-737-0222

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MBUYAMBA BELLA-LUFU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLA-LUFU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MBUYAMBA BELLA-LUFU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLA-LUFU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 31 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 31 Oct 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

Training

Medical School: Universit‚ de Kinshasa, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012