THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1090 Peter Robertson BLVD
unit #104
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-0000
Fax: (905) 799-1966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1090 Peter Robertson BLVD
unit #104
Brampton Ontario L6R 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-0000
Fax: (905) 799-1966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPIKA GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPIKA GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2012