THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:51:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Fifth St
Etobicoke ON M8V 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162526471
Fax: 416 252 4474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Fifth St
Etobicoke ON M8V 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162526471
Fax: 416 252 4474

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELISE MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELISE MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012