THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-0173
Fax: (705) 725-9575
Address: 29 Sperling Dr
COVID, Cold & Flu Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4M 6K9
Phone: 705-797-3120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit D12
829 Big Bay Point Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S6
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 112
121 Wellington St W
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Bell Farm Rd., #101
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 1400
7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 1A1
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1813 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2A3
Phone: (705) 222-9038
Fax: (705) 222-9041
Address: NA-House Calls
Name of the Clinic: Maple
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-0173
Fax: (705) 725-9575
Address: 29 Sperling Dr
COVID, Cold & Flu Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4M 6K9
Phone: 705-797-3120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit D12
829 Big Bay Point Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S6
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 112
121 Wellington St W
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 125 Bell Farm Rd., #101
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 1400
7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil Ontario L9S 1A1
Phone: 705-726-1544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1813 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2A3
Phone: (705) 222-9038
Fax: (705) 222-9041
Address: NA-House Calls
Name of the Clinic: Maple
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMONORI ALEXANDER YOKOGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOKOGAWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMONORI ALEXANDER YOKOGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOKOGAWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012