THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:35:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PCRM Edmonton
300-9888 Jasper Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
Edmonton Alberta T5J5C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780-990-4442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PCRM Edmonton
300-9888 Jasper Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
Edmonton Alberta T5J5C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780-990-4442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE SHINYOUNG AHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE SHINYOUNG AHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2013