THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Science
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Physical medicine &Rehab M1-37
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43650
Fax: (905)575-2598
Address: 541 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Phone: (905)685-1381
Extension: 85303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Science
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Physical medicine &Rehab M1-37
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43650
Fax: (905)575-2598
Address: 541 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Phone: (905)685-1381
Extension: 85303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 19 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATJANA ZDRAVKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZDRAVKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATJANA ZDRAVKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZDRAVKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013