THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:36:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
EL - Adolescent Medicine
10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2013