THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:35:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Developmental Pediatrics
02 Aug 2016 to 28 Aug 2016
Queen's University
EL - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Developmental Pediatrics
DATE: 02 Aug 2016 to 28 Aug 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 10 Jan 2013 to 06 Feb 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2013