THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Colorectal Surgery
22 Sep 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
University of Toronto
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
15 Feb 2013 to 30 Mar 2013
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - General Surgery
04 Jan 2013 to 14 Feb 2013
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: EL - Colorectal Surgery
DATE: 22 Sep 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 15 Feb 2013 to 30 Mar 2013
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - General Surgery
DATE: 04 Jan 2013 to 14 Feb 2013
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2013