THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:11:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Malaya, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
North Richmond Hill Clinic
Suite 412
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1M5
Phone: 9058843000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Malaysia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mong Tieng Ee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: University of Malaya, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
North Richmond Hill Clinic
Suite 412
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1M5
Phone: 9058843000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Malaysia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mong Tieng Ee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONG TIENG EE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONG TIENG EE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Malaya, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2013