THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric palliative care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-523-6300
Extension: 4674
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L2
Phone: 613-236-3000
Extension: 4674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric palliative care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-523-6300
Extension: 4674
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L2
Phone: 613-236-3000
Extension: 4674
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN MARIE KWOLEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOLEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN MARIE KWOLEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOLEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2013