THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Vienna, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Vienna, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Vienna, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
21 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jan 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 21 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jan 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2013