THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:28:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parking lot 409 Tache Avenue
409 Tache Ave
St Boniface Hospital Dept of Internal Medicine
Unit C5105
Winnipeg Manitoba R2H 2A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-258-1437
Fax: 204-233-7154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parking lot 409 Tache Avenue
409 Tache Ave
St Boniface Hospital Dept of Internal Medicine
Unit C5105
Winnipeg Manitoba R2H 2A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-258-1437
Fax: 204-233-7154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDIP SINGH BHANGOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDIP SINGH BHANGOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2013