THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Highroad South
Carbonear General Hospital
Family Practice Clinic
Carbonear NL A1Y 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7099455111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taha Abdulkhaliq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Highroad South
Carbonear General Hospital
Family Practice Clinic
Carbonear NL A1Y 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7099455111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taha Abdulkhaliq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHA IBRAHIM ABDULKHALIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULKHALIQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHA IBRAHIM ABDULKHALIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULKHALIQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2013