THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:26:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2013