THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:21:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
24 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
01 Apr 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 24 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Apr 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2013