THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Grant Medical College, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office/Clinic Address:
306-1333 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-3916
Fax: 416-551-4438
Address: Centre for Complex Diabetes Care (NYGH)
Suite E-7, 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 4167566923
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: 416-551-3916
Fax: 416-551-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram Chandurkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chandurkar (CPSO#: 100001 )
Business Address: Suite 306
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 551-3916
Business Address: 336 - 555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 635-2575
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: NYGH Diabetes Centre
2 Champagne Dr, Unit E7
Toronto ON M3JOK2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Grant Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office/Clinic Address:
306-1333 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-3916
Fax: 416-551-4438
Address: Centre for Complex Diabetes Care (NYGH)
Suite E-7, 2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 4167566923
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: 416-551-3916
Fax: 416-551-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram Chandurkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chandurkar (CPSO#: 100001 )
Business Address: Suite 306
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 551-3916
Business Address: 336 - 555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 635-2575
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: NYGH Diabetes Centre
2 Champagne Dr, Unit E7
Toronto ON M3JOK2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM CHANDURKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDURKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIKRAM CHANDURKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDURKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Grant Medical College, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2013