THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:20:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department Of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Anees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anees (CPSO#: 100004 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 252-4448
Business Address: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
(519) 252-4448

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department Of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 01 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Anees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anees (CPSO#: 100004 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 252-4448
Business Address: 2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1T3
(519) 252-4448

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Muhammad Yousuf Anees may practise medicine independently in Internal
Medicine, Critical Care Medicine, Respirology and Sleep Medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Muhammad Yousuf Anees may practise medicine independently in Internal
Medicine, Critical Care Medicine, Respirology and Sleep Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2013