THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:03:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3110
Fax: (519) 663-3473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sposato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sposato (CPSO#: 100010 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3110

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3110
Fax: (519) 663-3473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Argentina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sposato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sposato (CPSO#: 100010 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3110

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANO ALBERTO SPOSATO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. SPOSATO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SPOSATO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANO ALBERTO SPOSATO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. SPOSATO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SPOSATO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SPOSATO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2013