THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 10:55:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Howard University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Road East
Ironoak Medical Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-0813
Fax: 905-338-5747
Address: 1140 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Unit A6
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A3
Phone: 905-287-0006
Fax: 1-844-901-4365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tina Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tran (CPSO#: 100024 )
Business Address: 1670 North Service Road East
Ironoak Medical Clinic
112
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G3
905-338-0813
Business Address: Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
8333 Weston Road
Suite 310
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Howard University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Road East
Ironoak Medical Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-0813
Fax: 905-338-5747
Address: 1140 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Unit A6
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A3
Phone: 905-287-0006
Fax: 1-844-901-4365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tina Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tran (CPSO#: 100024 )
Business Address: 1670 North Service Road East
Ironoak Medical Clinic
112
Oakville Ontario L6H 7G3
905-338-0813
Business Address: Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
8333 Weston Road
Suite 310
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
(905) 850-3250

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Jan 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 16 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tina Minh Tam Tran may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tina Minh Tam Tran may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Howard University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2013