THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:27:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PARKDALE CLINIC
334-737 PARKDALE AVE
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18936
Fax: 613-761-5371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maher M. Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matar (CPSO#: 100038 )
Business Address: 29 Rideau Heights Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2E 7A7
6138507874

Corporation Name: Maher M. Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PARKDALE CLINIC
334-737 PARKDALE AVE
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18936
Fax: 613-761-5371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maher M. Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matar (CPSO#: 100038 )
Business Address: 29 Rideau Heights Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2E 7A7
6138507874

Corporation Name: Maher M. Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHER M MATAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHER M MATAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2013