THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:39:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Philomark Medical Center
Unit 8
4120 Dixie Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 614-0112
Fax: (905) 614-1493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nashwa Shenouda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shenouda (CPSO#: 100052 )
Business Address: Philomark Medical Center
Suite 8
4120 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4V8
(905) 614-0112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Philomark Medical Center
Unit 8
4120 Dixie Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 614-0112
Fax: (905) 614-1493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nashwa Shenouda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shenouda (CPSO#: 100052 )
Business Address: Philomark Medical Center
Suite 8
4120 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4V8
(905) 614-0112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASHWA THABET MOUSSA SHENOUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENOUDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASHWA THABET MOUSSA SHENOUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENOUDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2013