THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:59:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 875-7115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arif Rafiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rafiq (CPSO#: 100056 )
Business Address: Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(506) 875-7115

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 875-7115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arif Rafiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rafiq (CPSO#: 100056 )
Business Address: Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(506) 875-7115

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF RAFIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF RAFIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2013