THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:50:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-3200
Fax: (519) 354-6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Wolting Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wolting (CPSO#: 100101 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C5
519 354 3200

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Wolting Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-3200
Fax: (519) 354-6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Wolting Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wolting (CPSO#: 100101 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C5
519 354 3200

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Wolting Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SARAH WOLTING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLTING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SARAH WOLTING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLTING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2013