THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:17:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 14195
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 14195
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial
Hospital, 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirley C.C. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huang (CPSO#: 100104 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 14195
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 14195
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial
Hospital, 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shirley C.C. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huang (CPSO#: 100104 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY CHIEN-CHIEH HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY CHIEN-CHIEH HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2013