THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:31:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Oradea, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital-WOHS
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memoria Hospital
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jagdeesh K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 100121 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Oradea, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital-WOHS
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memoria Hospital
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jagdeesh K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 100121 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jagdeesh Kaur Dhaliwal may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jagdeesh Kaur Dhaliwal may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Oradea, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2013