THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898637422
Fax: 9058158988

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 100131 )
Business Address: 412 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(289) 863-7422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898637422
Fax: 9058158988

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 100131 )
Business Address: 412 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(289) 863-7422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONJA GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONJA GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2013