THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorders Centre
7Mc - 410
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Address: SickKids
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfonso Fasano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fasano (CPSO#: 100137 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorders Centre
7MCL 412
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorders Centre
7Mc - 410
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Address: SickKids
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfonso Fasano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fasano (CPSO#: 100137 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorders Centre
7MCL 412
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALFONSO FASANO may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALFONSO FASANO may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013