THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Oramasionwu, Maureen Chiazo (Used Until: 20 Mar 2013)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4th Floor D4
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Obstetrics & Gynecology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-8902
Fax: (613) 728-4745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAUREEN OKONKWO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Okonkwo (CPSO#: 100147 )
Business Address: 101-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613-728-8902
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-761-4401

General Information

Former Name: Oramasionwu, Maureen Chiazo (Used Until: 20 Mar 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4th Floor D4
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Obstetrics & Gynecology
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-8902
Fax: (613) 728-4745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 08 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAUREEN OKONKWO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Okonkwo (CPSO#: 100147 )
Business Address: 101-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613-728-8902
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-761-4401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAUREEN CHIAZO OKONKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKONKWO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAUREEN CHIAZO OKONKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKONKWO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2013