THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 Lake Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-6555
Fax: 905-685-6558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander R. Nowicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nowicki (CPSO#: 100155 )
Business Address: Montebello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
Suite 8
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5Y1
(905) 685-6555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 Lake Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-685-6555
Fax: 905-685-6558

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander R. Nowicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nowicki (CPSO#: 100155 )
Business Address: Montebello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
Suite 8
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5Y1
(905) 685-6555

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jun 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 24 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alexander Robert Nowicki may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alexander Robert Nowicki may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2013