THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:18:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 300
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054785909
Fax: 7053160999
Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. M. McDougall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McDougall (CPSO#: 100172 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 300-1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
(705) 478-5909

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 300
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054785909
Fax: 7053160999
Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. M. McDougall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. McDougall (CPSO#: 100172 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 300-1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
(705) 478-5909

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KINA MARIE MERWIN MCDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOUGALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KINA MARIE MERWIN MCDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2013